Unangst et al v. Contra Costa County of the State of California, et al

Plaintiff: Steven Unangst and Karla Garvey
Defendant: Contra Costa County of the State of California, Joan Miller, Monica Madrigal, Families for Children, Inc., David Schwartz, Dorothy Brown, Robyn Fuchs and Contra Costa County, Employment & Human Services, Children & Family Services
Case Number: 3:2016cv00680
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 Joint MOTION to Dismiss [Stip and Order re Dismissal] filed by David Schwartz, Motions terminated: 27 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
July 20, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Time to Respond to the Cross-Claim of Robyn Fuchs filed by Families for Children, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 5, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant Robyn Fuchs's Request for Telephonic Appearance signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 61 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unangst et al v. Contra Costa County of the State of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Unangst
Represented By: Larry Edward Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Garvey
Represented By: Larry Edward Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County of the State of California
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Miller
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Madrigal
Represented By: D. Cameron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Families for Children, Inc.
Represented By: Robert N. Berg
Represented By: Celina Christine Kirchner
Represented By: David Michael Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schwartz
Represented By: Elizabeth Gong Landess
Represented By: Alan F. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Brown
Represented By: M. Alieu Iscandari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County, Employment & Human Services, Children & Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?