Bongiovanni v. NRG Energy, Inc.

Plaintiff: Zachary Bongiovanni
Defendant: NRG Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00686
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 6/29/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 2/3/2017. Expert disclosures 3/27/2017. Expert rebuttal 4/17/2017. Expert discovery cut-off 5/21/2017. Deadline to file dispositive motions 2/ 23/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 6/6/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 7/10/2017 - 7/20/2017 at 8:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 14, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by NRG Energy, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 31, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by NRG Energy, Inc. filed by NRG Energy, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
February 29, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CORRECTED filed by Zachary Bongiovanni Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 17, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/17/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bongiovanni v. NRG Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Bongiovanni
Represented By: Sean Desmond McHenry
Represented By: Aaron Paul Minnis
Represented By: Sonya Lisa Smallets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Represented By: Zachary W Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?