Resource Renewal Institute et al v. National Park Service et al

Plaintiff: Resource Renewal Institute, Center for Biological Diversity and Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: National Park Service and Cicely Muldoon
Case Number: 3:2016cv00688
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 46:1156
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Temporarily Stay Litigation and Extend Pending Deadlines filed by Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, Resource Renewal Institute, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Temporarily Stay Litigation and Extend Pending Deadlines, 86 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief. Replies due by 11/2/2016. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 10:00 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Status Report due by 10/17/2016.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/27/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
August 11, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 79 Stipulation TO SUSPEND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 5, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFSREQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFINGSCHEDULE re: 75 Letter filed by Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, Resource Renewal Institute. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/5/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 27, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY CLAIMS filed by Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, Resource Renewal Institute, Cicely Muldoon, National Park Service. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/27/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 22, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: REFERRAL FOR EARLY MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/22/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 19, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AND VACATING JULY 21, 2016 HEARING re 31 MOTION for Discovery - PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM REGARDING REASONABLE DISCOVERY filed by Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, Resource Renewal Institute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/19/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 6, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 MOTION for Discovery - PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM REGARDING REASONABLE DISCOVERY filed by Western Watersheds Project, Center for Biological Diversity, Resource Renewal Institute Status Report due by 7/15/2016. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/06/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 15, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PRODUCTION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
June 1, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Setting Briefing Schedule (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
February 26, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2016 at 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/26/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resource Renewal Institute et al v. National Park Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resource Renewal Institute
Represented By: Jesse P Basbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Chanin
Represented By: Laurence Jordan Lucas
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Zultoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jesse P Basbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Chanin
Represented By: Laurence Jordan Lucas
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Zultoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Jesse P Basbaum
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Chanin
Represented By: Laurence Jordan Lucas
Represented By: Elizabeth Hunter Zultoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cicely Muldoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?