Byard et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Alan Byard, Robert L. Burns, Calvin C. Wiley, John J Andrews, Scott Hart, Todd Hart, Samuel J Reyes, Sr, Theodore Torres, John Barry, Serge J White, San Francisco Patrol Special Police Officers Alliance, San Francisco Patrol Special Police Offiers Association Inc, San Francisco Patrol Special Police, Hanley Chan, Earl L Curtis, Anthony Cirimele and John Fitzinger
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department, Gerald Darcy, Martin O'Halloran, Ueugen Geleano, John Bragagnolo, Jesus Pena, Michael Simmons, Peter Thoshinsky, John Van Koll and Randy Ly
Case Number: 3:2016cv00691
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' INSCRUTABLE RECORD ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 4/10/2017 at NOON. Replies due by 4/13/2017 at NOON. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/6/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REQUEST FOR CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT AS MODIFIED by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 88 Administrative Motion extend page limit.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REFERRING EXTENSION REQUEST TO JUDGE RYU. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/13/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on March 1, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE by Hon. William Alsup granting 43 Administrative Motion to continue trial date. Jury Selection set for 5/22/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND FOR DISMISSAL OF CONTRACT CLAIM AND DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byard et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Darcy
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Halloran
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ueugen Geleano
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bragagnolo
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Pena
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Simmons
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Thoshinsky
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Van Koll
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Ly
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Byard
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Burns
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin C. Wiley
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Andrews
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hart
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hart
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel J Reyes, Sr
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Torres
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Barry
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serge J White
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Patrol Special Police Officers Alliance
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Patrol Special Police Offiers Association Inc
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Patrol Special Police
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanley Chan
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl L Curtis
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cirimele
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fitzinger
Represented By: Daniel Bakondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?