Jesse Cole v. East Bay Municipal Utility District

Plaintiff: Jesse Cole
Defendant: East Bay Municipal Utility District
Case Number: 3:2016cv00694
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is dismissed with prejudice; provided however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, with proof of service of a copy to opposing counsel, within 90 days from the date of this order, that the agreed co nsideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/9/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
June 1, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 22 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 16, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/16/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
March 23, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint due by 04/06/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
February 22, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/22/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesse Cole v. East Bay Municipal Utility District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Cole
Represented By: Michael Alexander Schreiber
Represented By: Ryan Joshua Vlasak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Bay Municipal Utility District
Represented By: Ashley Adrianne Baltazar
Represented By: Patrick M. Glenn
Represented By: Maria Lourdes Matthew
Represented By: Craig Stephen Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?