McCarthy v. Emerald Investments, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert McCarthy
Defendant: Emerald Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00759
Filed: February 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of prosecution and failure to timely serve defendants with summons and complaint. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/4/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 21, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/4/2016 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by NOON ON 8/2/2016. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/21/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
May 24, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Emerald Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McCarthy
Represented By: David C. Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?