International Test Solutions, Inc v. MIPOX International Corporation et al
Plaintiff: International Test Solutions, Inc
Defendant: MIPOX International Corporation and MGN International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00791
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 150 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 148 to Continue Dates In Scheduling Order [Dkt. 127]. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 12/7/2017 continued to 5/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial p reviously set for 6/4/2018 continued to 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference previously set for 5/24/2018 continued to 11/29/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 142 TO CONTINUE DATES IN SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/5/2017 continued to 12/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/8/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 128 PERMITTING THE PARTIES TO AMEND THEIR PATENT LOCAL RULE 3-1 AND 3-3 CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING 111 PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS DEFENDANT MIPOX CORPORATIONS SEVENTH COUNTERCLAIM AND STRIKE ITS THIRD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017) Modified on 5/16/2017 (cl, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending The Time for Parties to Submit Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/12/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Responsive and Reply Claim Construction Briefs. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO DISCLOSE INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Markman Hearing set for 1/30/2017 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/26/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Test Solutions, Inc v. MIPOX International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Test Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Charanjit Brahma
Represented By: Marcus T. Hall
Represented By: Dean Allen Morehous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIPOX International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGN International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?