Cour v. Life360, Inc.

Plaintiff: Terry Cour, II
Defendant: Life360, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00805
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Defendant's motion to dismiss. 48 Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment is denied. 47 Plaintiff's motion to stay is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/28/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
May 11, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 26 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
April 8, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Gregory D. Beaman.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cour v. Life360, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life360, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Cour, II
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Todd M Logan
Represented By: Ari J. Scharg
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?