Klahn v. Dublin Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Daniel P. Klahn, Sr.
Defendant: Dublin Police Department, Alameda County Sheriff's Dept., Michael J. Popins, Gregory J. Ahern, Santa Rita Jail, Monterey County Sheriff's Department, Steve Bernal, Bonnie Dumanis, Anna Winn, Laura J. Copsey and Ennis
Case Number: 3:2016cv00833
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 25, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
May 12, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 65 Defendant County of Alameda's Motion to Dismiss and Dismissing the Third Amended Complaint in Its Entirety under 28 U.S.C. section 1915. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
February 13, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 34 Defendant Winn's Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend and granting 35 the County of Alameda's Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
July 12, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re sufficiency of 1 Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Plaintiff may proceed against Defendants Winn and Ennis, or may file an amended complaint to pursue claims against certain other defendants no later than August 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 12, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero discharging 12 Order to Show Cause, vacating July 8, 2016 hearing, continuing case management conference to August 12, 2016 at 2:00 PM, and granting 14 Motion to Appear by Telephone as to the August 12 case management conference only. Klahn must apply separately to appear by telephone at future hearings and conferences. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 15, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/8/2016 02:00 PM. Initial case management conference set for 78/16 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/15/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klahn v. Dublin Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Klahn, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dublin Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Popins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rita Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Dumanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura J. Copsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?