Hernande v. Randstad North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ernest J. Hernande
Defendant: Randstad North America, Inc., Randstad Staffing, U.S., L.P. and Carl Zeiss Meditec Group
Case Number: 3:2016cv00866
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/26/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
July 12, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
March 4, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/16. (dlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernande v. Randstad North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstad North America, Inc.
Represented By: Nabeel Ahmad
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randstad Staffing, U.S., L.P.
Represented By: Nabeel Ahmad
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Zeiss Meditec Group
Represented By: Nabeel Ahmad
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest J. Hernande
Represented By: Bryan J. McCormack
Represented By: Paul Kenneth Pfeilschiefter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?