Alexis v. Lew

Plaintiff: Eric Alexis
Defendant: Eugene Lew
Case Number: 3:2016cv00905
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/30/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
July 21, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELIEVING STEVEN R. YOURKE AS PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY OF RECORD by Judge Alsup granting 37 Stipulation; granting 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
June 28, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE ONE HOUR DEPOSITION DEADLINE FOR 30 DAYS by Judge Alsup granting 32 ; granting 33 Stipulation. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 13, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 28 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
March 23, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexis v. Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Alexis
Represented By: Steven Robert Yourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?