Settgast v. Maine Mineral & Gem Museum et al

Plaintiff: Stephan Settgast
Defendant: Maine Mineral & Gem Museum, Darryl Pitt, Lawrence Stifler and Mary McFadden
Case Number: 3:2016cv00909
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/13/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
June 30, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/30/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
March 31, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES re 9 Order Reassigning Case. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/31/16. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2016. Initial Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2016 02:30 PM. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Settgast v. Maine Mineral & Gem Museum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Settgast
Represented By: Joseph Curtis Edmondson
Represented By: Keith Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maine Mineral & Gem Museum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Stifler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?