Huntsberry v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Dianne Huntsberry
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv00929
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 14 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS 15 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 12 REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: SERVICE AND SUMMONS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/18/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntsberry v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Huntsberry
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?