Foos v. Swords to Plowshares

Plaintiff: Daniel Foos
Defendant: Swords to Plowshares
Case Number: 3:2016cv00948
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/14/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
August 10, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend mediation deadline re 17 Proposed Order filed by Swords to Plowshares, 16 Stipulation filed by Swords to Plowshares. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/10/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
May 6, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 8 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foos v. Swords to Plowshares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swords to Plowshares
Represented By: Bernadette Bantly
Represented By: Arthur W. Curley
Represented By: Peter Frederick Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Foos
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?