KHN Solutions Inc. v. Vertisense Inc.

Plaintiff: KHN Solutions Inc.
Defendant: Vertisense Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00962
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 7, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 69 Administrative Motion Administrative or Enlargement of Time re 67 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement, 68 Clerk's Notice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
October 14, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 62 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 11, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 58 Stipulation to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
September 30, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 22 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
June 9, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 53 Administrative Motion to Submit a Statement of Recent Decision re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 101. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 19, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/19/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 18, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Administrative Motion for Relief to Submit Statement of Recent Decision. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
April 27, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING APRIL 28, 2016 ORAL ARGUMENT re 30 . Signed by Judge haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/27/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 26, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Administrative Motion for Order Permitting Use of Equipment During the April 28, 2016 Motion to Dismiss Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KHN Solutions Inc. v. Vertisense Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHN Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Represented By: Pamela K. Fulmer
Represented By: Adam R. Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertisense Inc.
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Represented By: Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?