Saal v. CVS Pharmacy

Plaintiff: Heather Saal
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv00968
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 16, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 21 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 14, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/14/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saal v. CVS Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Saal
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Max A. Stein
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Stewart M. Weltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Gregory Beaman
Represented By: Nancy E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?