United States of America v. Lui

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Lawrence Y. Lui
Case Number: 3:2016cv00969
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request To Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States of America. Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
July 31, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUMMONSES IN PART, GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS DOCUMENT SUMMONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 45 Motion to Quash; denying 59 Motion to Dismiss; granting 32 Motion to Quash. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
September 7, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE A SUR-REPLY re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ORDER TO ALLOW RESPONDENT TO FILE A SUR REPLY filed by Lawrence Y. Lui. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
July 6, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARINGS ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO QUASH REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
April 18, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Lawrence Y. Lui. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
March 15, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS SHOULD NOT BE ENFORCED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/7/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lawrence Y. Lui
Represented By: Martin Aaron Schainbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?