Banawis-Olila v. World Courier Ground, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Obie Banawis-Olila
Defendant: World Courier Ground, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv00982
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 46 Motion to Compel; denying 50 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 4, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 43 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
July 29, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 35 Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Vacating Hearing.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
June 21, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/21/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 23, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
March 23, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/23/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banawis-Olila v. World Courier Ground, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obie Banawis-Olila
Represented By: Frank P. Sarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Courier Ground, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Donelan
Represented By: Naki Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Donelan
Represented By: Naki Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?