Great American Insurance Company et al v. Spherion Pacific Workforce, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company and California Physicians' Service
Defendant: Spherion Pacific Workforce, LLC, Spherion Atlantic Workforce, LLC and SFN Professional Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00986
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND AND MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 18 Motion for Leave to File; granting 19 Motion to Remand. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OTHER DEADLINES filed by California Physicians' Service, Great American Insurance Company. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
June 27, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by California Physicians' Service, Great American Insurance Company; 19 MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco filed by California Physicians' Service, Great American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
May 27, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 10 Request to Continue Case Management Conference and Other Deadlines filed by California Physicians' Service, Great American Insurance Company. Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company et al v. Spherion Pacific Workforce, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spherion Pacific Workforce, LLC
Represented By: Randy Scott Erlewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spherion Atlantic Workforce, LLC
Represented By: Randy Scott Erlewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFN Professional Services LLC
Represented By: Randy Scott Erlewine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: John Robert Armstrong, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Physicians' Service
Represented By: John Robert Armstrong, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?