Malibu Media, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.223.182.35

Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.223.182.35
Case Number: 3:2016cv01014
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Hon. William Alsup granting 27 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Henrik Mosesian Mosesi for Malibu Media, LLC,Henrik Mosesian Mosesi for Malibu Media, LLC. Attorney Brenna E. Erlbaum terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
August 15, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 22, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 8/23/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/21/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/5/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 6, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SEALING MOTION AND EXTENDING DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANT by Hon. William Alsup granting 9 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
March 23, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting 6 Motion for Leave to File].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.223.182.35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Brenna Elsie Erlbaum
Represented By: Brian Morgan Heit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 73.223.182.35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?