AIX Specialty Insurance Company v. Ferratex, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: AIX Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Ferratex, Inc. and Jason Gilmer
Case Number: 3:2016cv01023
Filed: March 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/4/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong: denying 34 Administrative Motion to Stay Discovery without prejudice to the filing of a motion for a protective order to limit the scope of discovery. This matter is referred to the Chief Magistrate Judge for the assignment of a Magistrate Judge for purposes of resolving any discovery disputes. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016).
June 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE; REFERRING CASE TO ENE; AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion to Stay Discovery due by 7/11/2016. Responses due by 7/25/2016. Replies due by 8/1/2016. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2016. Further Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2016 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIX Specialty Insurance Company v. Ferratex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIX Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Feeley
Represented By: Colrena Kay Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferratex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Gilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?