Sai v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Sai
Defendant: David Smith, Jim Adams, Champagne Ellison, Covenant Aviation Security (CAS), Transportation Security Administration (TSA), Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States of America, Kimberly Walton, William McKenney, Seena Foster, Zachary Bromer, Jeremy Buzzell and Erika Lucas
Case Number: 3:2016cv01024
Filed: February 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 249 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Kirstjen Nielsen. Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 247 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT COVENANT AVIATION SECURITY, LLC filed by Sai. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 244 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Kirstjen Nielsen. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 240 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Stay Pending Further ADR filed by Kirstjen Nielsen. Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 236 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Settlement Conference and Schedule filed by Kirstjen Nielsen. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Protective Order Briefing Schedule filed by Kirstjen Nielsen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Correction to Third Amended Complaint filed by Covenant Aviation Security, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 179 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation [for the Limited Purpose of Disclosing Contact Information Pertaining to Defendant John Orille [ECF Doc. 173]filed by Covenant Aviation Security, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 118 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 123 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Briefing Schedule, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 118 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 121 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 109). Responses due by 10/6/2017. Replies due by 10/20/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Transportation Security Administration (TSA), Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re time to file second amended complaint, and to respond filed by Sai. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Time for Covenant Aviation Security, LLC to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond filed by Covenant Aviation Security, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 64 Motion to Quash Service of Summons; finding as moot 67 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 67 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 67 Motion for Discovery. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re MTD Briefing Schedule filed by Transportation Security Administration (TSA), Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: EX PARTE STATUS UPDATE AND MOTION FOR STAY/TOLLING re 21 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay all deadlinesEx Parte MOTION to Continue case management conferenceEx Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File complaint and IFP motion filed by Sai. Amended Pleadings and IFP Application due by 7/31/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sai v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champagne Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Aviation Security (CAS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Security Administration (TSA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seena Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Bromer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Buzzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?