Hanover Insurance Company v. Paul M. Zagaris, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Paul M. Zagaris, Inc., Jon Paul Zagaris, Karrie Goold, Danielle Hardcastle, Esther Gutierrez, Fred Oshtory and Michael P Dutra
Case Number: 3:2016cv01099
Filed: March 3, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/23/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
January 3, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
July 21, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Clerk's Notice, to reschedule pre-settlement conference telephone conference, filed by Esther Gutierrez, Karrie Goold, Jon Paul Zagaris, Danielle Hardcastl e, Paul M. Zagaris, Inc., Michael P Dutra, Fred Oshtory Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2016 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/21/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
June 23, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY OR DISMISS AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR MEDIATION [re 33 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Esther Gutierrez, Karrie Goold, Jon Paul Zagaris, Danielle Hardcastle, Paul M. Zagaris, Inc., Michael P Dutra, Fred Oshtory]. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Mediation/Settlement. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/23/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 21, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 24, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 36 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 6, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 21, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 26 Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Esther Gutierrez, Karrie Goold, Jon Paul Zagaris, Danielle Hardcastle, Paul M. Zagaris, Inc., Michael P Dutra, Fred Oshtory. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Insurance Company v. Paul M. Zagaris, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Hegen
Represented By: Perry Michael Shorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Zagaris, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Paul Zagaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karrie Goold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Hardcastle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Oshtory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Dutra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?