Cabiness v. Educational Financial Services

Plaintiff: Winifred Cabiness
Defendant: Educational Financial Services
Case Number: 3:2016cv01109
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Case Management Conference filed by Winifred Cabiness. Motions due by 10/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
April 11, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 91 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Educational Financial Solutions, LLC filed by Educational Financial Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
March 22, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Winifred Cabiness. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
January 17, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 60 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
November 7, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Hearing and Setting Briefing Schedule on re 60 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Action filed by Winifred Cabiness. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
June 22, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 24 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Action filed by Educational Financial Services. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 14, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 MOTION to Continue STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Educational Financial Services. Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2016 at 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
May 20, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/20/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 2, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EVIDENCE PRESENTATION: If the scope of the order (such as the phrase "regardless of storage or retention medium or method" or the phrase "regardless of associated con tent") poses burdens, the court will consider limiting the scope of the preservation order or authorizing another method to preserve the forensic evidence relevant to the claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/2/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabiness v. Educational Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winifred Cabiness
Represented By: Sharon Djemal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?