Pratt v. Hedricks et al
Plaintiff: Ryant Trimale Pratt
Defendant: B. Hedricks, V. Solis and R. Martinez
Case Number: 3:2016cv01129
Filed: March 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: PSLC MSH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 29 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion due by 5/3/2017.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF SERVICE re 14 Amended Complaint filed by Ryant Trimale Pratt Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 1/17/2017.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/18/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 1 Complaint filed by Ryant Trimale Pratt. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/29/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/30/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Hedricks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryant Trimale Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Hedricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?