Delaney v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jacqulyn Delaney
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv01149
Filed: March 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 22, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2017 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/24/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/22/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
March 23, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/23/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 3, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
June 30, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroo m 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Jury Selection/Trial set for 11/27/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/30/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delaney v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqulyn Delaney
Represented By: David Wayne Taft Brown
Represented By: Paul Edward Heidenreich
Represented By: Edward Arthur Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen P. Ellingson
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Represented By: Jonathan Ki Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?