Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan v. Golden West Envelope Corporation

Plaintiff: Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan
Defendant: Golden West Envelope Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv01151
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/11/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 8, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating CMC Hearing and Ordering Plaintiff to File Status Report by 8/15/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/8/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
May 23, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 13 Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/23/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
April 11, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/11/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan v. Golden West Envelope Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees On Behalf of Supplemental Income 401(k) Plan
Represented By: Catherine E. Arostegui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden West Envelope Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?