Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. DOE-69.181.52.57

Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Defendant: DOE-69.181.52.57
Case Number: 3:2016cv01164
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 30 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ISSUE RULE 45 SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 11, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying without prejudice 27 Motion for Discovery. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 5, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/6/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/5/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
March 14, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO EXPEDITE DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/14/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 11, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 5 Motion for Discovery.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dallas Buyers Club LLC v. DOE-69.181.52.57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club LLC
Represented By: James Stephen Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE-69.181.52.57
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?