Desert Survivors, et al v. US Department of the Interior, et al
Plaintiff: Desert Survivors, Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians and Western Watersheds Project
Defendant: US Department of the Interior and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 3:2016cv01165
Filed: March 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 REMEDY ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 24, 2018. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 130 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 133 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 135 Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties shall meet and confer and submit within 10 days a proposed schedule for submitting briefs addressing the appropriate remedy in light of the Court's decision. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Produce and setting Further Case Management Conference for June 30, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 34 MOTION to Complete the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 6, 2017. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 12 Motion to Transfer Case. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Survivors, et al v. US Department of the Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Survivors
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Alicia Ellen Thesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Alicia Ellen Thesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Alicia Ellen Thesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Lisa T. Belenky
Represented By: Deborah Ann Sivas
Represented By: Alicia Ellen Thesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?