Doe No. 59 v. Santa Rosa City Schools

Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 59
Defendant: Santa Rosa City Schools
Case Number: 3:2016cv01256
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE by Hon. William H. Orrick re 73 Administrative Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
June 12, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/12/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
April 10, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 STIPULATION to Continue Fact and Expert Discovery Cutoff Dates. Close of Fact Discovery continued to 4/24/2017. Expert Discovery deadlines continued 14 days. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 1, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF JUVENILE RECORD by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 54 Motion to Compel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 13, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 STIPULATION re 23 Pretrial Order to Continue Fact and Expert Discovery Cutoff. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/10/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/13/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
June 20, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING ADR PROCESS. The Order adopting the parties' stipulation to participate in Mediation through the ADR Unit (Dkt. 17 ) is VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe No. 59 v. Santa Rosa City Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 59
Represented By: Arick W Fudali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa City Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?