Alvarez v. Bluestem Brands, Inc.

Plaintiff: Patti Alvarez
Defendant: Bluestem Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01272
Filed: March 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 13 STIPULATION To Vacate Entry Of Default Against Defendant Bluestem Brands, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/10/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 6, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/6/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 2, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO VACATE CMC PENDING RESOLUTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/2/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Bluestem Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Alvarez
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestem Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?