Walintukan v. SBE Entertainment Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Deric Walintukan
Defendant: SBE Entertainment Group, LLC, 6021 Hollywood Investor, LLC and 6021 Hollywood Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv01311
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Deric Walintukan. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
April 5, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Summary-Judgment/Adjudication Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by Deric Walintukan. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
February 15, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 43 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
January 12, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO HOLD ADR SESSION filed by 6021 Hollywood Operating Company, LLC, 6021 Hollywood Investor, LLC, SBE Entertainment Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
November 30, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Reschedule Hearing and Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by 6021 Hollywood Operating Company, LLC, 6021 Hollywood Investor, LLC, SBE Entertainment Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
October 20, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Deric Walintukan. Plaintiff's motion to amend due 11/6/2016. Defendant's opposition due 12/7/2016. Pla intiff's reply to Defendant's opposition due 12/21/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
July 14, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Protective Order filed by 6021 Hollywood Operating Company, LLC, 6021 Hollywood Investor, LLC, SBE Entertainment Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 15, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by 6021 Hollywood Investor, LLC, 6021 Hollywood Operating Company, LLC, SBE Entertainment Group, LLC and Plaintiff Deric Walintukan filed by 6021 Hollywood Operating Company, LLC, 6021 Hollywood Investor, LLC, SBE Entertainment Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walintukan v. SBE Entertainment Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deric Walintukan
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Marc L. Godino
Represented By: Mark Samuel Greenstone
Represented By: Michael Joe Jaurigue
Represented By: Abigail Ameri Zelenski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBE Entertainment Group, LLC
Represented By: Witt W Chang
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Ari N. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6021 Hollywood Investor, LLC
Represented By: Witt W Chang
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Ari N. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6021 Hollywood Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Witt W Chang
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Ari N. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?