Rodrigues v. Bank of America, NA et al

Plaintiff: Michael L. Rodrigues
Defendant: Bank of America, NA and Bank of America Pension Plan
Case Number: 3:2016cv01390
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2017. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/2/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
July 1, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Strike. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
May 16, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike DEMAND FOR JURY filed by Bank of America, NA, Bank of America Pension Plan. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/16/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 22, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2016 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/22/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodrigues v. Bank of America, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Rodrigues
Represented By: Wallace Charles Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA
Represented By: Susan Tayeko Kumagai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Pension Plan
Represented By: Susan Tayeko Kumagai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?