B. et. al. v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ryan B. and William B.
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv01402
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/04/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING THE FILING OF DOCUMENTS APPLICABLE TO ALL RELATED CASES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 16-1402 DMR is related to Case No. 12-2819 MMC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 23, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. et. al. v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan B.
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B.
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?