Misson v. Cal-X Trans, Inc.

Plaintiff: Hakam Misson
Defendant: Cal-X Trans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01408
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT & RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS CASE. The case is dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/10/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
November 22, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/22/2017. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 7, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause response due by 11/17/2017. The 11/28/2017 case management conference is continued to 2/13/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/7/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misson v. Cal-X Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakam Misson
Represented By: Sunita Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-X Trans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?