Kaur v. Office Depot, Inc.

Plaintiff: Alamdeep Kaur
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01410
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Joint Stipulated Request For Referral To Magistrate For Settlement Conference And Continuance of Expert Discovery Deadline filed by Office Depot, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
October 3, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Protective Order filed by Office Depot, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
July 6, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Mediation and First-Stage Discovery filed by Alamdeep Kaur. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 29, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 6/30/2016. Parties to submit proposed first-stage discovery and mediation deadline 7/8/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 12/16/2016. Deadline to file dispositive motions 1/18/2017. E xpert disclosures 3/31/2017. Expert rebuttal 4/22/2017. Expert discovery cut-off 5/15/2017. Pretrial conference statement due 5/23/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/26/2017 - 7/10/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 9, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Alamdeep Kaur filed by Alamdeep Kaur. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaur v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alamdeep Kaur
Represented By: Jacob George
Represented By: Abraham Mathew
Represented By: Sang J Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?