Rushing v. Williams-Sonoma, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William Rushing
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma, Inc., Williams-Sonoma Advertising, Inc., Williams-Sonoma DTC, Inc., Williams-Sonoma Stores, Inc., Pottery Barn, Inc., Pottery Barn Kids, Inc., Pottery Barn Teen, Inc. and West Elm, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01421
Filed: March 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part, 70 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference continued to 4/4/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/08/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 28, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss. Rushing is given limited leave to amend and shall file his amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 8, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Stipulated Request to Continue February 28, 2017 Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/08/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 20, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from February 8, 2017 to February 22, 2017. Hearing on 50 Motion to Dismiss set for 2/22/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/20/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
December 6, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE, HEARING DATE, AND CMC. Deadlines reset as to 50 MOTION to Dismiss: Response due by 12/9/2016; Reply due by 1/9/2017; Motion Hearing continued to 2/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Conference continued to 2/28/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2017). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/6/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
October 5, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Stipulation. Case Management Conference continued to 2/7/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2017. The hearing on the motion to dismiss shall be set on January 11, 2017 at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 23, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/23/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 15, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 26 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 4, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/03/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
May 5, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 STIPULATION. Case Management Conference continued to 9/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushing v. Williams-Sonoma, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma Advertising, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma DTC, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Sonoma Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottery Barn, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottery Barn Kids, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottery Barn Teen, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Elm, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Okhaifo Aigboboh
Represented By: P. Craig Cardon
Represented By: Eric James DiIulio
Represented By: Dylan John Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rushing
Represented By: George Richard Baker
Represented By: Kathryn Honecker
Represented By: Lauren Nageotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?