Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc. v. Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC

Plaintiff: Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc.
Defendant: Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv01471
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 22, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 12/19/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
August 1, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
June 27, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 8(A) and 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 20, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc. v. Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lil' Man in the Boat, Inc.
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auk Ta Shaa Discovery, LLC
Represented By: Howard Holderness
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?