A.C.L. Computers and Software,Inc. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: A.C.L. Computers and Software, Inc.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2016cv01485
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/7/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
July 12, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/12/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
June 23, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 6/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/23/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016) Modified on 6/23/2016 (mklS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.C.L. Computers and Software,Inc. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.L. Computers and Software, Inc.
Represented By: James Cai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?