Whitworth v. SolarCity Corp.

Plaintiff: Ravi Whitworth
Defendant: SolarCity Corp.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01540
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/15/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
November 16, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 15 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
June 20, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/20/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitworth v. SolarCity Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravi Whitworth
Represented By: Julia Rabinovich
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarCity Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?