William G. Chernoff v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: William G Chernoff
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NBS Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv01563
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/22/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
August 8, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO STAY ENTIRE ACTION filed by William G Chernoff. Motions terminated: 29 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Case stayed. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/29/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
April 18, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/18/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 4, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Plaintiff and defendants' counsel shall participate in a telephone conference, to be scheduled by the ADR Unit as soon as possible but no later than May 4, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C Spero on 4/4/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William G. Chernoff v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G Chernoff
Represented By: Jasmin B. Bhandari
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Joseph Scali
Represented By: John Patrick Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Represented By: Stephen T. Hicklin
Represented By: Robert Betuel Norum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?