Chin et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Plaintiff: Patrick Chin and UTAP Printing Co., Inc.
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 3:2016cv01571
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 14, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/13/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
June 20, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference continued to 7/5/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chin et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Chin
Represented By: Joel Philip Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTAP Printing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joel Philip Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Gary R. Gleason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?