Gallegos v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco

Plaintiff: Matthew Gallegos
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2016cv01588
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 79 68 Stipulated Request for Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/16/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
February 27, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting (53) Motion to Amend/Correct ; GallegosOross is required to E-FILE the amended document in case 3:16-cv-01588-LB; granting (43) Motion to Amend/Correct ; GallegosOross is required to E-FILE the amended docu ment in case 3:16-cv-02489-LB. The court directs the parties to confer about their schedule and submit a updated case-management statement by March 2, 2017. The court will set a case-management conference for March 9, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
June 7, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Strike. The court has struck a small amount of material from Paragraph 10 of the Complaint (ECF No. 1). The plaintiff has 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint that omits the struck material. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Gallegos
Represented By: Deborah Marie Kochan
Represented By: Mathew Nimrod Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Represented By: Lisa Barnett Sween
Represented By: Stephanie TaiHsin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?