Newmark Realty Capital, Inc. v. BGC Partners, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Newmark Realty Capital, Inc.
Defendant: BGC Partners, Inc. and Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv01702
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/7/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 679 OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE SEALING MOTIONS IN CONNECTION WITH THE PARTIES' DAUBERT BRIEFING AND EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/28/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER DENYING 607 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO SUBMIT NEW EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/2/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER DENYING 358 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/13/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER DENYING 415 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY THE CASE; ORDER TERMINATING 416 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR BRIEFING AND TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE AS MOOT; AND ORDER GRANTING 431 , 434 PARTIES' REQUESTS FOR CONSIDERATION OF NEW EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/16/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER RE: 407 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE FILED PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/22/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER ON 410 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO TAKE ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/21/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER ON 396 CHRIS CARAS' REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF CBRE EMAILS BECAUSE OF CHANGE OF CIRCUMSTANCES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/4/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 FURTHER ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL (In Re: Dkt. Nos. 361 , 368 , 370 , 372 , 376 , 379 and 382 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/30/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER DENYING IN PART 145 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS ARE NOT IN CIVIL CONTEMPT OF COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER; AND ORDER REGARDING 207 , 222 PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO SUBMIT NEW EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/29/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER ON 384 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR WITHDRAWAL OF THE COURT'S MAY 18, 2018 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/25/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND SETTING HEARING TO ADDRESS THE COURT'S QUESTIONS (In re: Docket Nos. 361 , 368 , 370 , 372 , 376 , 379 and 382 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/24/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 373 NON-PARTY CHRIS CARAS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/23/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER DENYING 348 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/15/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER ON 356 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ESI FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/14/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER ON 353 STATEMENT RE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO REVISED SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/11/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER ON 347 JOINT STATEMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE ESI AND MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/9/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER ON 338 JOINT STATEMENT RE FURTHER MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NEWMARK & COMPANY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/8/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER ON 337 CORRECTED JOINT STATEMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (NOS. 164-255). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/7/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER ON 320 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF FURTHER DISCOVERY DISPUTE RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ESI FROM PLAINTIFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/2/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER ON 313 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS' FURTHER MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/1/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER ON 304 JOINT STATEMENT RE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT NEWMARK & COMPANY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/25/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER ON 275 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/19/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER ON (1) 234 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF DISCOVERY LIMITS; (2) 246 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SERVE SUBPOENAS BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS; AND (3) 248 JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO DAVID MILESTONE AND KEVIN SHANNON. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/20/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER ON 192 JOINT STATEMENT RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE HOWARD LUTNICK DEPOSITION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/1/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/13/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER ON PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING (In re: ECF Nos. 119 and 122 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/16/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER MODIFYING 99 ORDER RE 95 SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/8/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 95 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ON 68 PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/15/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newmark Realty Capital, Inc. v. BGC Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newmark Realty Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Laura L. Chapman
Represented By: Michelle D. Kahn
Represented By: Toni Qiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BGC Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory S. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmark & Company Real Estate, Inc
Represented By: Gregory S. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?