Musick v. United States Postal Service et al

Plaintiff: Deborah E Musick and Jan Y Kraepelin
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2016cv01721
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 30, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 STIPULATION Selecting ADR Process. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 10, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/10/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musick v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah E Musick
Represented By: Zachary Ethan Zwerdling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Y Kraepelin
Represented By: Zachary Ethan Zwerdling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?