Various, Inc. v. Jedi Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Various, Inc.
Defendant: Jedi Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01833
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SEALING MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 18, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/18/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 13, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRIAN E. HAAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 12, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup denying 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
June 8, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 36 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 7, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND RELATED DEADLINES Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/7/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 19, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 6/2/2016. Replies due by 6/9/2016. Sur-replies due by 6/16/2016. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 16, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
April 22, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GIANNA E. CRICCO-LIZZA PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 19, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS, Motions terminated: 12 11 10 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Various, Inc. v. Jedi Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Various, Inc.
Represented By: Gianna Elissa Cricco-Lizza
Represented By: Kimberly Irene Culp
Represented By: Ralph Albert Dengler
Represented By: Frank M. Gasparo
Represented By: William Andrew Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?