C.F., et al v. San Lorenzo Unified School District

Plaintiff: C.F. and Catrina Childs-Fong
Defendant: San Lorenzo Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2016cv01852
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
October 24, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/15/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
August 29, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
July 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for stay of all dates. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
May 4, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/4/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.F., et al v. San Lorenzo Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.F.
Represented By: Jean Murrell Adams
Represented By: Gail Susan Hodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrina Childs-Fong
Represented By: Jean Murrell Adams
Represented By: Gail Susan Hodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Lorenzo Unified School District
Represented By: Katherine A. Alberts
Represented By: Brian Anthony Duus
Represented By: Louis Anthony Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?