John Utne v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: John Utne
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv01854
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 204 RE PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL DATE filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Jury Selection/Trial set for 3/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/10/20. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 192 Pretrial Schedule and Trial Date. Jury Selection/Trial set for 1/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/26/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 189 re Pretrial Schedule and Trial Date AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Jury Selection/Trial set for 12/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/17/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/17/2020 (cl, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 187 to Extend Expert Deadlines, Defendant's Decertification Motion Briefing Deadlines and Hearing on Motion to Decertify AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/27/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT DEADLINES, DEFENDANT'S DECERTIFICATION MOTION BRIEFING DEADLINES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtr oom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 157 Extend Expert Deadlines, Defendant's Decertification Motion Briefing Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Jury Selection/Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco , Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/14/19. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (clS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 154 TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DECERTIFY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 150 Extending Expert Deadlines, Decertification Motion Deadline, Pretrial Conference and Trial Date. Jury Selection/Trial set for 6/1/2020 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/6/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/11/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 53 Granting Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Resetting Summary Judgment and Class Certification Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/16/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Confidential Discovery Material. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 28 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING MOTION RELATE CASES (re ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To consider whether cases should be related, ECF No. 59 in 3:14-cv-04858-JST). Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Utne v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Liz Kathryn Bertko
Represented By: Donna Marie Mezias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Utne
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?