Curtis Timm v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Curtis Timm
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv01873
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 5, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDLING ORDER. Discovery due by 3/29/2017; Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2017 03:00 PM. Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 6/26/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. ( 26 STIPULATION Re: Revised Case Schedule TERMINATED). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/5/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 8, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulated Protective Order For Standard Litigation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Timm v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert John Romero
Represented By: Ray Tamaddon
Represented By: Catharine Michelle Tolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Timm
Represented By: Eric J. Ratinoff
Represented By: Marla Carrie Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?