Stetson University, Inc.-v-Frederick Acker et al

Plaintiff: Stetson University, Inc.
Defendant: Frederick G. Acker, The C. Paul Johnson Family Charitable Foundation, Inc. and Frederick G. Acker Trustee of the C. Paul Johnson 2003 Trust
Case Number: 3:2016cv01905
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCINDING MEDIATION REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SALLIE KIM AND REFERRAL TO USDC ADR PROGRAM FOR MEDIATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 39 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
August 25, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JARED R. CLOUD PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 3, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JARED R. CLOUD by Hon. William Alsup denying 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 28, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ADR COMPLIANCE AND PLEADING DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting 24 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 11, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 30, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ADR COMPLIANCE AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting 19 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stetson University, Inc.-v-Frederick Acker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stetson University, Inc.
Represented By: Lynde Selden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The C. Paul Johnson Family Charitable Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Acker Trustee of the C. Paul Johnson 2003 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?